Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0942409

EP0942409 - Phoneme-based speech synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/37]Phonem based speech synthesis
[2003/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Masayuki
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1999/37]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99301674.005.03.1999
[1999/37]
Priority number, dateJP1998005724909.03.1998         Original published format: JP 05724998
[1999/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0942409
Date:15.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0942409
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0942409
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G10L13/06
[2003/33]
Former International [1999/37]G10L5/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [1999/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Phonembasierte Sprachsynthese[2003/33]
English:Phoneme-based speech synthesis[2003/33]
French:Synthèse de la parole à partir de phonèmes[1999/37]
Former [1999/37]Phonem basierte Sprachsynthese
Former [1999/37]Phonem based speech synthesis
Examination procedure05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
10.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2004Fee for grant paid
26.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Request for further processing for:24.04.2003Request for further processing filed
24.04.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.06.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9504988  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1,12,23,25,26 * abstract * * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 25 - line 31 * * page 5, line 32 - line 36 * * page 7, line 7 - line 15 * * page 9, line 3 - line 13 * [A] 8,12,19,24;
 [A]US4979216  (MALSHEEN BATHSHEBA J [US], et al) [A] 1,8,12,19,23-26;
 [A]EP0805433  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1,8,12,19,23-26 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 12 * * column 5, line 31 - line 43 *;
 [A]  HIROKAWA T ET AL, "HIGH QUALITY SPEECH SYNTHESIS SYSTEM BASED ON WAVEFORM CONCATENATION OF PHONEME SEGMENT", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, vol. 76A, no. 11, ISSN 0916-8508, page 1964-1970, XP000420615 [A] 1,8,12,19,23-26 * the whole document *
 [A]  BLOMBERG M ET AL, "Creation of unseen triphones from diphones and monophones using a speech production approach", PROCEEDINGS FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING (ICSLP '96), PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, IEEE, New York, NY, USA, (19961003), ISBN 0-7803-3555-4, pages 2316 - 2319 vol.4, XP002123415 [A] 25,26 * page 2316 - page 2317 *