Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0942006

EP0942006 - Catalyst for olefin polymer production and process for olefin polymer production employing the catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOSOH CORPORATION
4560, Kaisei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
TOSOH CORPORATION
4560, Kasei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Satoru
1659 Taguchishinden, Komono-cho
Mie-gun, Mie / JP
02 / Yano, Akihiro
6-7-8, Betsumei
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP
[1999/37]
Representative(s)Copsey, Timothy Graham , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Copsey, Timothy Graham , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [1999/37]Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas , et al
KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street
London, WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date99301730.008.03.1999
[1999/37]
Priority number, dateJP1998005658509.03.1998         Original published format: JP 5658598
JP1999000380311.01.1999         Original published format: JP 380399
[1999/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0942006
Date:15.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0942006
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0942006
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/602, C08F4/606, C08F10/00
[1999/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2001/04]
Former [1999/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Katalysator für Olefinpolymerisation und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Olefinpolymer unter Verwendung desselben[1999/37]
English:Catalyst for olefin polymer production and process for olefin polymer production employing the catalyst[1999/37]
French:Catalyseur de polymérisation d'oléfines et procédé de production de polymère d'oléfines utilisant celui-ci[1999/37]
Examination procedure19.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/37]
23.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2002Fee for grant paid
14.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0658576  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 30; example 1 *;
 [A]  - GOLUB, A. S. ET AL, "Formation of intercalation compounds of MoS2 with alkali metal and alkylammonium cations from a monolayer dispersion of molybdenum disulfide", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19951113), vol. 123, no. 20, Database accession no. 274205, XP002133340 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
    [] - IZV. AKAD. NAUK, SER. KHIM. (1993), (4), 672-4,