Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0941718

EP0941718 - Acetabular prosthesis with ring lock mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
Depuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Professional, Inc.
325 Paramount Drive
Raynham, Massachusetts 02767-0350 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ostiguy, Pierre S.
15 Clark Court
Rochester, Massachusetts 02770 / US
02 / Sommerich, Robert E.
5 Beach Street
Norton, Massachusetts 02766 / US
 [2004/03]
Former [1999/37]01 / Ostiguy, Pierre S.
15 Clark Court
Rochester, Massachusetts / US
02 / Sommerich, Robert E.
5 Beach Street
Norton, Massachusetts 02766 / US
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99301886.012.03.1999
[1999/37]
Priority number, dateUS1998003903313.03.1998         Original published format: US 39033
[1999/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0941718
Date:15.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0941718
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0941718
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/34
[1999/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2001/25]
Former [1999/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hüftgelenkpfannenprothese mit Ringverriegelungsmechanismus[1999/37]
English:Acetabular prosthesis with ring lock mechanism[1999/37]
French:Prothèse acétabulaire avec mécanisme de verrouillage à bague[1999/37]
Examination procedure26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
21.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2004Fee for grant paid
15.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.06.2004
[2008/17]
Documents cited:Search[XAY]FR2684544  (MEDINOV SA) [X] 22 * page 5, line 14 - page 8, line 20; figures 1-10; claim 9 * [A] 1,2,5,6,10,11,18 [Y] 24;
 [YA]US5725591  (CIPOLLETTI GEORGE B ET AL) [Y] 24 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 38; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,2,6,10-13,18,19,23
by applicantUS4619658
 US4770658
 US4784663
 US4969910
 US5049158
 US5171285