Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0947928

EP0947928 - A method and apparatus for structured memory analysis of data processing systems and applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2008
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2008  [2008/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mandal, Manas
3201 Duval Road, Apt. 1522
Austin, Texas 78759 / US
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Waldner, Philip
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Waldner, Philip
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date99302225.023.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateUS1998005233131.03.1998         Original published format: US 52331
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0947928
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0947928
Date:21.04.2004
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/34, G06F11/32
[2004/17]
Former International [1999/40]G06F11/34, G06F12/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/02]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur strukturierten Speicheranalyse von Datenverarbeitungssystemen und Anwendungen[1999/40]
English:A method and apparatus for structured memory analysis of data processing systems and applications[1999/40]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour l'analyse de mémoire structurée de systèmes de traitement de données et applications[1999/40]
Examination procedure14.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/42]
12.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/50]
25.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
20.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200810   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5721917  (LECHTENBERG DAVID R ET AL) [X] 1-16 * figures 8,10 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 4 * * column 9, lines 31-40 * * column 10, line 51 - column 11, line 48 * * column 12, lines 1-13 * * column 15, lines 9-47 * * column 16, lines 1-5 * * claim 12 *;
 [XA]US5408650  (ARSENAULT MARK E) [X] 8,15 * figure 2 * * column 1, lines 1-3 * * column 1, lines 37-42 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 57 * * column 8, lines 47-65 * [A] 1-7,9-14,16
 [XA]  - GOLDBERG A ET AL, "Interrupt-based hardware support for profiling memory system performance", COMPUTER DESIGN: VLSI IN COMPUTERS AND PROCESSORS, 1995. ICCD '95. PROCEEDINGS., 1995 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUSTIN, TX, USA 2-4 OCT. 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19951002), ISBN 0-8186-7165-3, pages 518 - 523, XP010197359 [X] 8,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-7,9-14,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCD.1995.528917