Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0945704

EP0945704 - Optical fiber gyroscope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.05.2005  [2005/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
HITACHI CABLE, LTD.
1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8338 / JP
For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yuhara, Toshiya
7-5, Hitaka-cho 4-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken 319-1414 / JP
02 / Soekawa, Hirokazu
13-4, Hitaka-cho 1-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken 319-1414 / JP
03 / Tetsu, Toshiyuki
184, Ohtsu-cho
Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki-ken 319-1702 / JP
04 / Ohnuki, Wataru
668, Arakawa
Takahagi-shi, Ibaraki-ken 318-0021 / JP
05 / Toyoda, Shuhei
Lumier Nanzan A-9, 25-1,Minamiyama-cho, Showa-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi-pref. 466-0835 / JP
06 / Ichigi, Takenori
185-105, Shimo-Ichiba, Shimo-Honmachi
Iwakura-city, Aichi-pref. 482-0005 / JP
[1999/39]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/39]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99302303.524.03.1999
[1999/39]
Priority number, dateJP1998008217527.03.1998         Original published format: JP 8217598
[1999/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0945704
Date:29.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0945704
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01C19/72, G02B6/44
[1999/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/36]
Former [1999/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Faserkreisel[1999/39]
English:Optical fiber gyroscope[1999/39]
French:Gyroscope à fibre optique[1999/39]
Examination procedure15.06.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
18.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/19]
06.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0383231  (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0791969  ;
 [A]JPH07280573  ;
 [A]JPH025008  ;
 [PX]EP0833128  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [PX] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900315), vol. 014, no. 138, Database accession no. (P - 1022), [A] 1 * abstract *