Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0948240

EP0948240 - Cooking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.08.2005  [2005/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirata, Kengo
3-5-9, Myojin, Oji-Cho
Kitakatsuragi-Gun, Nara / JP
02 / Kawaguchi, Shyuzi
2-6-5, Shikanjima, Konohana-Ku
Osaka-Shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Ikeda, Tadahito
6-7-18, Uriwari, Hirano-Ku
Osaka-Shi, Osaka / JP
04 / Takashige, Yutaka
4-31-21, Kamori-Cho
Kishiwada-Shi, Osaka / JP
05 / Otani, Hideaki
1-7-25, Kitaotomo-Cho
Tondabayashi-Shi, Osaka / JP
06 / Ito, Kyoko
182-9, 1-Chome, Takebuchihigashi
Yao-Shi, Osaka / JP
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99302326.625.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateJP1998008371230.03.1998         Original published format: JP 8371298
JP1998023294419.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23294498
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0948240
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0948240
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0948240
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/68
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/04]
Former [2000/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  LI 
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kochgerät[1999/40]
English:Cooking apparatus[1999/40]
French:Appareil de cuisson[1999/40]
Examination procedure28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2004Fee for grant paid
24.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0550312  (GOLD STAR CO [KR]) [X] 1,19 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 27 * * column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 5; figures 1A,1B *;
 [X]US5704277  (YUNG SIMON K C [HK]) [X] 5 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 9; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0482578  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,19 * column 25, line 35 - line 49 * * column 26, line 1 - column 28, line 5; figures 10-12,30,37A,37B *;
 [A]US4841125  (EDAMURA KAORU [JP]) [A] 1,19 * column 12, line 31 - column 13, line 8; figures 16,19,21 *;
 [A]EP0818942  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 6 * figures 2-4 *
by applicantJPH0917156
 JPH1047683
 JPH1047684
 JPH1047685
 JPH1047686
 JPS59183220