Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0948226

EP0948226 - Priority channel search based on spectral analysis and signal recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Dowling, Joseph
7925 Avenida Navidad No.296
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Former [1999/40]Higgin, Paul , et al
Nokia IPR Depratment, Nokia House, Summit Avenue
Southwood, Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB
Application number, filing date99302390.226.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateUS1998004940627.03.1998         Original published format: US 49406
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0948226
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0948226
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38, H04B7/26
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/29]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Suche von Prioritätskanälen mit Hilfe von Spektralanalyse und Signalerkennung[1999/40]
English:Priority channel search based on spectral analysis and signal recognition[1999/40]
French:Recherche de canaux prioritaires basé sur l'analyse spectrale et la reconnaissance de signaux[1999/40]
Examination procedure13.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
16.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/23]
07.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9705753  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * page 4, line 28 - line 33 * * page 5, line 10 - line 19 * * page 8, line 13 - line 19 * * page 9, line 5 - line 19 *;
 [AD]US5566201  (OSTMAN KJELL [FI]) [AD] 9 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 65; figure 1 *