Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0947328

EP0947328 - Ink cartridge and remaining ink volume detection method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.11.2006  [2006/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/49]For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sasaki, Toyonori
D-805, 2-1-1, Imaike-cho
Anjou-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99302481.930.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateJP1998008403730.03.1998         Original published format: JP 8403798
JP1998009477207.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9477298
JP1998009477307.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9477398
JP1998009477407.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9477498
JP1998009477507.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9477598
JP1998009477607.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9477698
JP1998009477707.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9477798
JP1998009477807.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9477898
JP1998014699328.05.1998         Original published format: JP 14699398
JP1998016692015.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16692098
JP1999002832005.02.1999         Original published format: JP 2832099
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0947328
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0947328
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0947328
Date:07.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   SE [2001/03]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenpatrone und Verfahren zur Detektion der restlichen Tintenmenge[1999/40]
English:Ink cartridge and remaining ink volume detection method[1999/40]
French:Cartouche d'encre et procédé de détection du volume d'encre restant[1999/40]
Examination procedure25.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2005Fee for grant paid
12.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02029048.2  / EP1300248
EP02029049.0  / EP1300249
Opposition(s)08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0573274  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 40-42,44 * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 14 * * figures 1,2,4,6 * [A] 18,21-25,43,45;
 [A]US5703633  (GEHRER UDO [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,12,14,17,30 * column 6, line 11 - column 8, line 37 * * figures 1,3,5,7 *;
 [A]EP0791464  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,10,12,16,18,29,30 * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 33 * * column 7, line 3 - line 31 * * column 14, line 4 - line 55 * * figures 1A,1B,14,15 *;
 [A]EP0765756  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,18,26,29 * page 9, line 19 - line 57 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0685340  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 10, line 44 - column 12, line 13 * * figures 3A-3C,5A,5B,14A-14C,21,22 *;
 [A]EP0631874  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 10, line 8 - column 11, line 52 * * column 13, line 4 - line 28 * * column 28, line 38 - column 29, line 41 * * figures 1B,2A,2B,4B,22,23A-23D *
by applicantJPH0970982
 JPH07132611