Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0947329

EP0947329 - Ink supply container for an ink jet printhead [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.09.2002  [2002/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, NY 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Binnert, Thomas R.
1388 East Lake Road
Hammondsport, NY 14840 / US
02 / Kupchik, Vladimir M.
38 Charmwood Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Walker, Antony James Alexander
W.P. Thompson & Co., Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Walker, Antony James Alexander
W.P. Thomson & Co., Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date99302527.931.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateUS1998005541706.04.1998         Original published format: US 55417
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0947329
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0947329
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenzufuhrbehälter für einen Tintenstrahldruckkopf[1999/40]
English:Ink supply container for an ink jet printhead[1999/40]
French:Réservoir d'alimentation pour une tête d'impression à jet d'encre[1999/40]
Examination procedure26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
23.07.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0589540  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 8, line 41 - page 13, line 13; figures 16-21 * [A] 3;
 [XP]EP0873870  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-3 * column 1, line 18 - line 32 *;
 [XA]EP0719646  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 6 - column 9, line 35; figures 1A-1B * [A] 3;
 [XP]EP0841169  (DYNAMIC CASSETTE INT [GB]) [XP] 1,4 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-3 *;
 [XP]EP0894630  (CANON KK [JP]) [XP] 1,4 * column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 22 * * column 11, line 50 - column 18, line 54; figures 1,5-9 *
by applicantUS5185614
 US4771295
 US5486855
 US4571599
 US4833491