blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969358 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969358



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 118
28.01.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
11.05.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 7
14.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 10
14.03.2007 Description Search / examination 7
14.03.2007 Description Search / examination 2
14.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.02.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.02.2005 General enquiry Search / examination 1
04.02.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.01.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.11.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
27.11.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.11.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.03.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 10
31.03.1999 Description Search / examination 37
31.03.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.1999 Drawings Search / examination 13
31.03.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6