blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969358


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.01.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
29.10.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
29.04.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
15.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.04.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.04.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.12.2006 First examination report
14.12.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
10.12.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
08.08.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  24.09.2003  [2003/39]
04.04.2003 Renewal fee
14.03.2003 Request for examination filed published on  02.05.2003  [2003/18]
22.11.2002 Publication of search report published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
19.04.2002 Renewal fee
05.04.2001 Renewal fee
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]