blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0969358
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3499135BGlobal Dossier 23.02.2004B2
JP2000020311 21.01.2000A
Priority number Date
JP18200198 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0969358Global Dossier 08.01.2003A3
EP0969358 05.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP18200198 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6421771 16.07.2002B1
US2002049895 25.04.2002A1
Priority number Date
JP18200198 29.06.1998