blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0969358

Designated contracting statesDE 
GB 
Examination procedure29.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
03.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201416   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:08.01.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:08.01.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:02.05.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030226
 
Event date:24.09.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE GB
 
Event date:17.01.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20061218
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20141001