Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969358

EP0969358 - Information processing device and method for performing parallel processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Aiichiro, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99302565.931.03.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018200129.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18200198
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969358
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969358
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/38
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/39]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenverarbeitungsschaltung und Verfahren zur paralleler Verarbeitung[2000/01]
English:Information processing device and method for performing parallel processing[2000/01]
French:Circuit à traitement de données et procédé à traitement en parallèle[2000/01]
Examination procedure26.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
18.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
29.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
03.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201416   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09134287  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,11,16 * abstract *;
 [PA]US5813045  (MAHALINGAIAH RUPAKA [US], et al) [PA] 1,11,16 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0736693  (NEC CORP) [A] 1,11,16 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH01167520  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD, et al)
 [A]  PARCERISA J-M ET AL, "Reducing wire delay penalty through value prediction", MICRO-33. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 33RD. ANNUAL ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE. MONTEREY, CA, DEC. 10 - 13, 2000, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA: IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20001210), ISBN 0-7695-0924-X, pages 317 - 326, XP010528898 [A] 1,2,6,7,11,14-16 * page 3, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 4 *