Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043577

EP1043577 - Tire pressure indicator including pressure gauges that have a self-generating power capability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huang, Tien-Tsai
No. 4-2, Lane 30, Wu-Chuan Street Pan-Chiao City
Taipei Hsien / TW
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Huang, Tien-Tsai
No. 4-2, Lane 30, Wu-Chuan Street
Pan-Chiao City, Taipei Hsien / TW
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Stonehouse, Sidney William
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Stonehouse, Sidney William
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date99302585.701.04.1999
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1043577
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01L17/00, G01L9/12, B60C23/04
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/26]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Anzeige des Reifendrucks mit Druckwandlern, welche die Fähigkeit besitzen, Leistung selbst zu erzeugen[2000/41]
English:Tire pressure indicator including pressure gauges that have a self-generating power capability[2000/41]
French:Dispositif d'indication de pression de pneu comprenant des indicateurs de pression avec capacité de puissance auto-gènèratrice[2000/41]
Examination proceduredeletedDespatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI
02.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
12.04.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.04.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC
15.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
12.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.05.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5889464  (HUANG TIEN-TSAI [TW]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - column 8, line 5 *;
 [YA]JPS58210534  ;
 [YA]EP0213727  (GARRETT CORP [US]) [Y] 1,4-8,10 * abstract * * page 3, column 21 - column 29 * * page 5, line 13 - line 31 * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 27 * * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 19 * [A] 2,3,9;
 [YA]JPH01307631  ;
 [A]DE3447397  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 21 - line 22 * * page 6, line 10 - line 17 * * page 10, line 15 - line 16 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2 *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840322), vol. 008, no. 060, Database accession no. (P - 262), [Y] 1,3-8,10 * abstract * [A] 2,9
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900226), vol. 014, no. 104, Database accession no. (P - 1013), [Y] 2,3,9 * abstract * [A] 1,4-8,10