Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978481

EP0978481 - Water purifier and method of water purification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 24.02.2016  [2016/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tokyo Biox Corporation
1-8 Higashikoiwa 3-chome, Edogawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Eizo, Tokyo Biox Corporation
1-8 Higashikoiwa 3-chome, Edogawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Ito, Naoki, Tokyo Biox Corporation
1-8 Higashikoiwa 3-chome, Edogawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Wise, Stephen James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Wise, Stephen James , et al
c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road
Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
Application number, filing date99302992.519.04.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998023498306.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23498398
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978481
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978481
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978481
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C02F3/34
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/12]
Former [2001/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [2001/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC 
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wasserreiniger und Verfahren zur Wasserreinigung[2000/06]
English:Water purifier and method of water purification[2000/06]
French:Epurateur d eau et procédé d épuration de l eau[2000/06]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure27.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
11.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2004Fee for grant paid
02.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.06.2001NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.07.2001
08.06.2001PT   M01   Fee paid on   02.07.2001
08.06.2001SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.07.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
ES17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
IE19.04.2004
LU19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
PT17.08.2004
[2016/08]
Former [2008/17]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
ES17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
IE19.04.2004
LU19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
PT17.08.2004
Former [2007/21]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
ES17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
IE19.04.2004
LU19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2006/13]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
IE19.04.2004
LU19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2005/24]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
IE19.04.2004
LU19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
LU19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2005/02]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
MC30.04.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI17.03.2004
SE17.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2535296  (REVERSO RICCARDO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5242593  (OBERKOFLER JOERG [AT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0372520  (OBERKOFLER JOERG [AT]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5716523  (POWLEN OWEN J [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]  FAID M ET AL, "Biotechnological process for the valorization of fish waste", DATABASE COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, Database accession no. EIX95172601992, XP002146951 [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] BIORESOURC TECHNOL;BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY 1994 ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, OXFORD, ENGL, (1994), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 237 - 241,