Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0951987

EP0951987 - Plate and section manufacturing process and installation, and plates and sections obtained using said process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/43]Plate and section manufacture
[2002/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITW Litec France
Zone Industrielle Des Jones
71700 Tournes / FR
[1999/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Birkel, Thierry
54 rue Loevenbruck
54500 Vandeouvre Les Nancy / FR
02 / Van De Ven, Jacques
La Corneille-Chemin des Rapes
1884 Villars / CH
03 / Regenass, Patrice
Les Noies Jean
70270 Ecromagny / FR
04 / Duchanois, Dominique
18 bis, rue de la Madeleine
70300 Luxeuil Les Bains / FR
[1999/43]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99303016.219.04.1999
[1999/43]
Priority number, dateFR1998000497021.04.1998         Original published format: FR 9804970
[1999/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0951987
Date:27.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0951987
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29D31/00, B29C69/02
[1999/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
Former [1999/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Platten und Profilelementen, und durch dieses Verfahren hergestellte Platten und Profilelemente[2002/06]
English:Plate and section manufacturing process and installation, and plates and sections obtained using said process[2002/06]
French:Procédé et installation pour la fabrication de plaques et profilés, et plaques et profilés ainsi obtenus[2002/06]
Former [1999/43]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Platten und Profilelementen
Former [1999/43]Plate and section manufacture
Former [1999/43]Procéde pour la Fabrication des Plaques et Profiles
Examination procedure03.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
02.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2002Fee for grant paid
28.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DY]FR2528350  (BRIAND JEAN PATRICK [FR]) [DY] 1-21,24 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9723333  (KHASHOGGI E IND [US]) [Y] 1-21,24 * page 1, paragraph 2; claim 1 *;
 [Y]FR2647129  (PYM 71 [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * claim 3 *;
 [A]EP0615838  (COFRADEC SA [FR]) [A] 2,3;
 [A]US5360586  (WYATT DANNY R [US], et al) [A] 1-3;
 [A]US5720913  (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al) [A] 1-3;
 [A]US4210618  (KIELLARSON FOLKE [SE], et al) [A] 1-3