blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0952708

EP0952708 - Token passing network system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.05.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.06.2009  [2009/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashimoto, Hiroshi
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Nagatani, Yuji
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Iwamoto, Kazuya
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[1999/43]
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Kerry John
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]Tomlinson, Kerry John
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99303049.320.04.1999
[1999/43]
Priority number, dateJP1998010951920.04.1998         Original published format: JP 10951998
[1999/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0952708
Date:27.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0952708
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/417
[1999/43]
CPC:
H04L12/417 (EP,US); H04L2012/40273 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1999/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Netzwerksystem mit Tokenübergabe[1999/43]
English:Token passing network system[1999/43]
French:Système de réseau à passage de jeton[1999/43]
Examination procedure08.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
12.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/24]
16.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
16.01.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/24]
Request for further processing for:22.06.2007Request for further processing filed
22.06.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.07.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4866706  (CHRISTOPHERSEN JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0470056  (MARELLI AUTRONICA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 46 * * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.