Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0951881

EP0951881 - External catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waight, Montague Crichton Every
48 Fort Road Newhaven
Sussex BN9 9EJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
Waight, Montague Crichton Every
48 Fort Road
Newhaven, Sussex BN9 9EJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/43]
Representative(s)Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]BROOKES & MARTIN
High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London, WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date99303071.721.04.1999
[1999/43]
Priority number, dateGB1998000848221.04.1998         Original published format: GB 9808482
[1999/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0951881
Date:27.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0951881
Date:07.06.2000
[2000/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/44
[1999/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/43]
TitleGerman:Aussenkatheter[1999/43]
English:External catheter[1999/43]
French:Cathéter externe[1999/43]
Examination procedure06.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
13.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
30.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5342583  (SON JONG E [KR]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 28; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3,9;
 [Y]FR2590160  (LANES RENEE [FR]) [Y] 3,9 * page 2, line 6 - line 34; figure . *;
 [A]GB2129304  (CRAIG MED PROD LTD) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9600096  (SALTZ JOAN [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO8804558  (CONKLING J MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US5681297  (HASHIMOTO TAKEO [JP], et al);
 [AD]US4886508  (WASHINGTON DOUGLAS L [US])
by applicantGB2239804
 US5618277
 WO9714353
 US4202057
 WO9000379
 US5300052