Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969117

EP0969117 - Method of forming a thermal barrier coating system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rigney, David Vincent
6838 Wetheridge Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45230 / US
02 / Wortman, David John
5614 Liberty Woods Court
Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US
03 / Rigny, Joseph David
1097 Deerhaven Court
Milford, Ohio 45150 / US
04 / Maricocchi, Antonio Frank
101 Citation Court
Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US
05 / Bruce, Robert William
221 Woodcrest Drive
Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. Essex House 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99303419.830.04.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010820101.07.1998         Original published format: US 108201
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969117
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969117
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/08, C23C14/30, C23C14/02, C23C28/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/39]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Wärmedämmschichtsystems[2000/01]
English:Method of forming a thermal barrier coating system[2000/01]
French:Procédé pour la production d'un système de revêtement de barrière thermique[2000/01]
Examination procedure10.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
14.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/12]
03.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200810   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4676994  (DEMARAY RICHARD E) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * column 2, line 33 - column 4, line 63 * [Y] 3;
 [XD]US5716720  (MURPHY KENNETH S) [XD] 1,2,9 * column 6, line 19 - line 49 *;
 [Y]US5059095  (KUSHNER BURTON A ET AL) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 42 - line 61 *
 [XA]  - KREUTZ E W ET AL, "A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF ZRO2 FILM DEPOSITION BY ELECTRON AND LASER RADIATION", COLLOQUE INTERNATIONAL SUR LE SOUDAGE ET LA FUSION PAR FAISCEAUX D'ELECTRONS ET LASER / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WELDING AND MELTINGBY ELECTRON AND LASER BEAMS,FR,ENNERY, INSTITUT DE SOUDURE, (19930614), vol. COLLOQUE 5, pages 475 - 487, XP000379809 [X] 1,4-7 * page 480, line 34, paragraph 3.2 - page 481, line 34; figures 6,7 * [A] 2,3,8-10