Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996260

EP0996260 - Wide area load distribution apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.07.2005  [2005/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/31]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takahashi, Eiichi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Aoki, Takeshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Kikuchi, Shinji, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Okano, Tetsuya, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99303468.504.05.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998030200923.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30200998
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996260
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996260
Date:10.07.2002
[2002/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996260
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04L29/06
[2002/28]
Former International [2000/17]H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/14]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Grossraumlastverteilung[2000/17]
English:Wide area load distribution apparatus and method[2000/17]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour répartition de charge à couverture étendue[2000/17]
Examination procedure17.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
20.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2004Fee for grant paid
27.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5774668  (CHOQUIER PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 21 - line 42 * * column 3, line 44 - line 52 * * column 8, line 6 - line 13 *;
 [A]US5341477  (PITKIN RICHARD P [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - line 62 *