Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957262

EP0957262 - Fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
5725 Delphi Drive
Troy, MI 48098 / US
[2001/12]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Cooke, Michael Peter
52 Burnt Oak Terrace
Gillingham, Kent ME7 1DR / GB
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2003/10]Keltie, David Arthur , et al
David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [1999/46]Bailey, Richard Alan , et al
Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date99303515.305.05.1999
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateGB1998001020813.05.1998         Original published format: GB 9810208
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0957262
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0957262
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0957262
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02M55/00, F02M47/02, F02M61/16
[1999/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/32]
Former [1999/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffinjektor[1999/46]
English:Fuel injector[1999/46]
French:Injecteur de combustible[1999/46]
Examination procedure10.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
17.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2004Fee for grant paid
28.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT01.09.2004
ES12.12.2004
GB05.05.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2006/35]ES12.12.2004
GB05.05.2005
Former [2005/27]ES12.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2112065  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,5-7,9 * page 1, line 78 - line 88; figure - * [A] 2,3,8;
 [PA]EP0844385  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [PA] 1 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 10; figures 1,2,5 * * column 19, line 15 - line 24; figure 11B *;
 [A]DE19738351  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 12 - line 38; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US5699770  (MATSUMOTO SHUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2C *