blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969276

EP0969276 - Method for estimating a tire wear life [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.07.2005  [2005/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome
Chuo-Ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimizu, Akiyoshi, c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
02 / Yamagishi, Naoto, c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
03 / Mouri, Hiroshi, c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
04 / Sasaka, Naohiro, c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
05 / Kobayashi, Hiroshi
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
06 / Haraguchi, Tetsunori
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
07 / Kato, Yasuyuki
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99303573.207.05.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998012617708.05.1998         Original published format: JP 12617798
JP1998012617608.05.1998         Original published format: JP 12617698
JP1998012617908.05.1998         Original published format: JP 12617998
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969276
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969276
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969276
Date:14.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:G01M17/02
[2000/01]
CPC:
B60C11/24 (EP,US); G01M17/02 (EP,US); G01N3/56 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0218 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/48]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Abschätzung von Lebensdauer und Verschleiss eines Reifens[2003/47]
English:Method for estimating a tire wear life[2000/01]
French:Procédé d'estimation de la durée de vie et de l'usure d'un pneu[2000/01]
Former [2000/01]Verfahren zur Abschätzung der Lebensdauer und den Verschleiss eines Reifens
Examination procedure27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
08.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2004Fee for grant paid
18.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04005418.1  / EP1429135
Opposition(s)15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3722270  (SPERBERG L) [A] 1,23* abstract *;
 [A]US3933036  (LIPPMANN SEYMOUR A, et al) [A] 1,23 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0504699  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,23 * abstract *
ExaminationJPH09329530
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.