Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978428

EP0978428 - Anti-theft system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.07.2002  [2002/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Safety Locks Ltd
Macmillan House, 96 Kensington High Street
London W8 4SG / GB
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Fry, Jay
37, Hillgate Place
London W8 7SS / GB
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Silverman, Warren
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Silverman, Warren
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99303627.610.05.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateGB1998000992108.05.1998         Original published format: GB 9809921
GB1998002725810.12.1998         Original published format: GB 9827258
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978428
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/00, B62H5/14
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Diebstahlsicherung[2000/06]
English:Anti-theft system[2000/06]
French:Dispositif anti-vol[2000/06]
Examination procedure08.11.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
01.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/28]
21.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/28]
Request for further processing for:26.11.1999Request for further processing filed
01.12.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.12.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200103   M06   Not yet paid