EP0962253 - A process for preparing a multi-metal oxide catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Manhua 1616 Holly Hill Lane Maple Glen, PA 19002 / US | 02 /
Linsen, Michael William 101 Hancock Road North Wales, PA 19454 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd., European Patent Department, 28th Floor, City Point, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
Former [1999/49] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303655.7 | 11.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | US19980086211P | 21.05.1998 Original published format: US 86211 P | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962253 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962253 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962253 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/02, B01J23/887, C07C51/215, C07C45/33 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C07C51/215 (EP,US);
B01J23/16 (KR);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/20 (EP,US);
B01J23/28 (EP,US);
B01J37/0236 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/33, C07C47/22 (EP,US);
C07C51/215, C07C57/04 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/55, B01J2523/56, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/46] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines multimetalloxidischen Katalysators | [1999/49] | English: | A process for preparing a multi-metal oxide catalyst | [1999/49] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un catalyseur d'oxydes multimétalliques | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 16.07.2002 | Appeal received No. T0964/02 | 07.09.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.11.2007 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 23.11.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 05.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP02009550.1 / EP1260495 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5380933 (USHIKUBO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [DX] 1-6,8-16 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10128112 ; | [A]JPH07315842 ; | [A]JPH1057813 ; | [A]JPH07232071 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 30, Database accession no. 1998-341402, XP002120385 & JPH10128112 A 19980519 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07315842 A 19951205 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-13,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10057813 A 19980303 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-6,8-16 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 44, Database accession no. 1995-339421, XP002120386 & JPH07232071 A 19950905 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 10-13,16 * abstract * | Examination | EP0529853 | by applicant | JPH10128112 | US5380933 |