Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957142

EP0957142 - Unsaturated polyester powder coatings with improved surface cure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
100 North Riverside Plaza, Randolph Street at the River Chicago
Illinois 60606 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
100 North Riverside Plaza, Randolph Street at the River
Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Muthiah, Jeno
110 Slater Drive
Wernersville, Pennsylvania 19565 / US
02 / Kozlowski, Joseph J.
504 Lawrence Avenue
Reading, Pennsylvania 19609 / US
03 / Shah, Navin B.
43 Saddle Curt
Sinking Spring, Pennsylvania 19608 / US
04 / Radcliffe, Paul H.
930 Saint Daniels Road
Robesonia, Pennsylvania 19551 / US
05 / Nicholl, Edward G.
817 North 5th Street
Reading, Pennsylvania 19601 / US
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB
Former [2004/22]Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd., 28th Floor, City Point, One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
Former [1999/46]Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date99303666.411.05.1999
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateUS1998007597811.05.1998         Original published format: US 75978
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0957142
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0957142
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0957142
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/03, C09D167/00, C09D167/06
[2000/05]
Former International [1999/46]C09D5/03, C09D167/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/41]
Former [1999/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pulverbeschichtungen aus ungesättigtem Polyester mit verbesserter Oberflächenvernetzung[1999/46]
English:Unsaturated polyester powder coatings with improved surface cure[1999/46]
French:Compositions de revêtement en poudre à base de polyester insaturé ayant un durcissement à la surface amélioré[1999/46]
Examination procedure16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2004Fee for grant paid
03.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
FR18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
[2006/32]
Former [2005/23]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2005/22]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/21]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/13]AT18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE18.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9738034  (HERBERTS & CO GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,14-17 * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 20; claims 1-7 * * page 8, line 33 - line 38 * [Y] 11,12;
 [Y]JPS57128715  ;
 [X]JPS5527324
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821109), vol. 006, no. 223, Database accession no. (C - 133), [Y] 11,12 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800508), vol. 004, no. 061, Database accession no. (C - 009), [X] 1-3,7-10 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0517535
 EP0600546