Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957304

EP0957304 - Coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.07.2003  [2003/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SATCHWELL CONTROL SYSTEMS LIMITED
P.O. Box 57 Farnham Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 4UH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
SATCHWELL CONTROL SYSTEMS LIMITED
P.O. Box 57 Farnham Road
Slough Berkshire SL1 4UH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Matthews, Dene
c/o Satchwell Control Systems Ltd., Farnham Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 4UH / GB
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Greenwood, John David
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Greenwood, John David
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Former [1999/46]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99303776.114.05.1999
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateEP1998030387615.05.1998         Original published format: EP 98303876
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0957304
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0957304
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16L29/00
[1999/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
Former [1999/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rohrverbindung[1999/46]
English:Coupling[1999/46]
French:Raccord de tuyaux[1999/46]
Examination procedure21.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
24.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU
25.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/27]
10.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5056755  (JANG YOUNG H [PA], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3844585  (SANDS R, et al) [Y] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4335747  (MITSUMOTO TAKASHI, et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 9,10 *;
 [A]DE3338241  (WIEDERAUFARBEITUNG VON KERNBRE [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * abstract *;
 [A]US3537477  (MAHOFF GEORGE A) [A] 1,5 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2314921  (BUNNELL FRED H) [A] 1,5 * figure 1 *