Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0959545

EP0959545 - Multi-part grommet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2010
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mori, Keisuke, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
[1999/47]
Representative(s)Wightman, David Alexander , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Wightman, David Alexander , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Former [1999/47]Spall, Christopher John
BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road
Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date99303798.514.05.1999
[1999/47]
Priority number, dateJP1998013726919.05.1998         Original published format: JP 13726998
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0959545
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0959545
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/22, H02G3/04, B60R16/02
[1999/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/29]
Former [1999/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mehrteilige Dichtungsbüchse[1999/47]
English:Multi-part grommet[1999/47]
French:Douille de traversée à plusieurs parties[1999/47]
Examination procedure09.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/47]
14.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/34]
12.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201012   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5588260  (SUZUKI SHIGEMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 4 - column 5, line 26; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]JPH06165340  (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5405672  (TAKIGUCHI SHUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *