blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0961388 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0961388



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 151
22.07.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.08.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.08.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
05.08.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
17.04.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.04.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.04.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
08.04.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
04.07.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
04.07.2007 Description Search / examination 3
04.07.2007 Description Search / examination 2
04.07.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.07.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
11.05.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
11.05.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.10.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 5
29.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
29.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
29.07.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.06.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.06.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.04.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.03.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
24.03.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.01.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.01.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
10.01.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.09.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.07.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
17.07.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.07.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
05.07.2000 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
07.06.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.10.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
18.05.1999 Description Search / examination 8
18.05.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
18.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 32
18.05.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6