blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0961388


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2011  [2011/28]
20.05.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2011  [2011/25]
11.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2010  [2010/28]
24.07.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.08.2009  [2009/35]
15.08.2008 (Expected) grant published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
13.08.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.08.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.04.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2007 First examination report
09.05.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.11.2006 Change - representative published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
08.08.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.06.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.04.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.05.2003 Renewal fee
28.05.2002 Renewal fee
02.08.2001 Change - extension states
22.05.2001 Renewal fee
30.03.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
26.01.2001 Request for examination filed published on  14.03.2001 [2001/11]
14.07.2000 Publication of search report published on  30.08.2000 [2000/35]
15.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.12.1999 [1999/48]