blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0961388
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000037060Global Dossier 02.02.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0961388Global Dossier 17.09.2008B1
EP0961388 30.08.2000A3
EP0961388 01.12.1999A2
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9901683 04.01.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1085433C 22.05.2002C
CN1237820 08.12.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69939567D 30.10.2008D1
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2313771T 01.03.2009T3
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9811457D 29.07.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6157110 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9811457 29.05.1998