Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0961388

EP0961388 - Rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES, IT
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Electric S.A.
Ruelle du Repos 18
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH
[1999/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Strobl, Georg
Distlerstrasse 22
70184 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Hocking, Adrian Niall , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
20 Imperial Square
Cheltenham
GL50 1QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/49]Hocking, Adrian Niall , et al
Marks & Clerk 27 Imperial Square
Cheltenham, GL50 1RQ / GB
Former [1999/48]Higgins, Michael Roger
A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square
Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB
Application number, filing date99303846.218.05.1999
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateGB1998001145729.05.1998         Original published format: GB 9811457
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0961388
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0961388
Date:30.08.2000
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0961388
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02K13/04, H02K3/44, H02K5/12
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/20]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Läufer[1999/48]
English:Rotor[1999/48]
French:Rotor[1999/48]
Examination procedure11.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
24.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2008Fee for grant paid
04.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB18.05.2009
IT18.05.2009
ES19.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]GB18.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9525885  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]EP0630095  (JOHNSON ELECTRIC SA [CH]) [A] * column 4, line 9 - column 4, line 49; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4800315  (SCHULZ MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] * column 2, line 17 - column 2, line 34; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US2381533  (FORSS FRITHIOF P) [A] * page 1, column R, line 23 - page 1, column R, line 33; figures 1,3 *
ExaminationUS5157299
 US4075522
 GB1155640