blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0964077 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0964077



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 722
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
06.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
25.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
19.01.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
19.01.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
16.01.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
04.11.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
05.10.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
05.10.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
05.10.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.09.2005 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.09.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.09.2005 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 5
31.08.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
23.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2005 Claims Opposition 3
20.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
19.08.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
12.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
08.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.08.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
01.08.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.07.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.07.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.07.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.07.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.07.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.06.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.05.2005 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2005 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2005 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
16.03.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
09.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2004 Claims Opposition 3
01.09.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
27.08.2004 Claims Opposition 3
27.08.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
29.04.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.04.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
04.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.02.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
23.02.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 7
23.02.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 7
16.02.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.02.2004 Request for documents Opposition 1
06.02.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 19
06.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
06.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 72
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
06.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.05.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.02.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.02.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
01.02.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
16.10.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.10.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.10.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
12.07.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
12.07.2002 Description Search / examination 12
12.07.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.03.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.03.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 9
31.12.2001 Description Search / examination 5
31.12.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
14.12.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 20
09.08.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
09.08.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
04.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
18.05.1999 Description Search / examination 22
18.05.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
18.05.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 46
18.05.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7