blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0964077


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.06.2008 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]
20.01.2006 Revocation of patent published on  08.03.2006  [2006/10]
16.12.2005 Change: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
30.09.2005 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.09.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
11.08.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.08.2005 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
28.07.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
23.07.2005 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.09.2004 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.06.2004 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
26.04.2004 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
16.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.06.2004  [2004/23]
13.02.2004 Opposition filed published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
09.05.2003 (Expected) grant published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
30.04.2003 Renewal fee
15.02.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.10.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.10.2002 Change - French title published on  20.11.2002  [2002/47]
27.09.2002 Change - French title published on  13.11.2002  [2002/46]
13.09.2002 Change - French title published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
19.07.2002 Examination report or reply
30.04.2002 Renewal fee
20.03.2002 Examination report or reply
14.01.2002 Examination report or reply
10.08.2001 First examination report
06.08.2001 Examination report or reply
04.05.2001 Renewal fee
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
26.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
29.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.12.1999 [1999/50]