blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0964077
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000026950Global Dossier 25.01.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0964077Global Dossier 25.06.2003B1
EP0964077 12.01.2000A3
EP0964077 15.12.1999A2
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2272815 29.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69909022T 08.07.2004T2
DE69909022D 31.07.2003D1
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9811456D 29.07.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL130141D 01.06.2000D0
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2216606 20.11.2003C2
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
UA65548 15.12.2000C2
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6221512 24.04.2001B1
Priority number Date
GB9811456 29.05.1998