blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0964077

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NL 
Examination procedure01.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted25.06.2003
Opposition procedure05.10.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:15.12.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:15.12.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000208
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:26.09.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010809
 
Event date:25.06.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:25.06.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:31.07.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69909022
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030731
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:23.01.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SIEMENS AG
Effective DATE:20040206
 
Event date:01.06.2004 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SIEMENS AG
 
Event date:11.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20050411
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:13.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20050413
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:13.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20050413
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:15.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20050415
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:11.05.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20050511
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:08.03.2006 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20050916
 
Event date:08.03.2006 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Free Format Text:20050916
 
Event date:01.05.2006 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20050916
 
Event date:31.08.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20100524
Year of Fee Payment:12