Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964077

EP0964077 - A metallic article having a thermal barrier coating and a method of application thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce plc
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
For all designated states
CHROMALLOY UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED
1 Linkmel Road Eastwood
Nottingham NG16 3RZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
ROLLS-ROYCE PLC
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
For all designated states
CHROMALLOY UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED
1 Linkmel Road
Eastwood, Nottingham NG16 3RZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Rickerby, David Stafford
11 Chevin Road
Duffield, Derby DE56 4DS / GB
[1999/50]
Application number, filing date99303864.518.05.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateGB1998001145629.05.1998         Original published format: GB 9811456
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0964077
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0964077
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0964077
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23C28/00, C23C14/22
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/38]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Metallischer Artikel mit einer Wärmesperrschicht und Verfahren zur Anwendung desselben[1999/50]
English:A metallic article having a thermal barrier coating and a method of application thereof[1999/50]
French:Article métallique ayant une couche de protection thermique et méthode pour son application[2002/44]
Former [1999/50]Article métallique ayant une couche de barrièrethermique et méthode pour son application
Examination procedure08.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
09.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2003Fee for grant paid
01.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2004  01.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2004  01.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2004/14]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2004   
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
29.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.08.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/10]
05.10.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.10.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2004/31]
Former [2004/23]DE26.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US5514482  (STRANGMAN THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-27;
 [AD]EP0718419  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-27;
 [AD]EP0718420  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-27
ExaminationEP0937787