Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977402

EP0977402 - Fair share scheduling of multiple service classes with prioritized shaping [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Canada Inc.
600 March Road P.O. Box 13600
Kanata, ON K2K 2E6 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2010/20]For all designated states
Alcatel Canada Inc.
600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600 Kanata
Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
Alcatel Canada Inc.
600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Newbridge Networks Corporation
600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Duckering, Brent G.
No. 304, 4838 Fraser Street
Vancouver, British Columbia V5V 4H4 / CA
02 / Robotham, Rob E.
64 Pleasant Park Road
Ottawa, Ontario K1H 5L8 / CA
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Nicolle, Olivier , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
32, avenue Kléber
92700 Colombes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Nicolle, Olivier , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2002/12]Feray, Valérie , et al
Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Former [2000/05]Hutchins, Michael Richard , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date99303877.723.04.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS1998006462323.04.1998         Original published format: US 64623
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977402
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977402
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977402
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04Q11/04
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/39]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerechte Bedienung von mehreren Verkehrsklassen mit Formung von Verkehr mit unterschiedlichen Prioritäten[2000/05]
English:Fair share scheduling of multiple service classes with prioritized shaping[2000/05]
French:Service équitable de plusieurs classes de traffic avec mise en forme prioritaire[2000/05]
Examination procedure05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
11.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.11.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
17.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2010Fee for grant paid
09.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
11.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.09.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES30.08.2010
[2011/25]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5724513  (BEN-NUN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [A] 2 * column 4, line 12 *
 [X]  PEHA J M, "THE PRIORITY TOKEN BANK: INTEGRATED SCHEDULING AND ADMISSION CONTROL FOR AN INTEGRATED-SERVICES NETWORK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19930523), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0950-2, pages 345 - 351, XP000371116 [X] 1-4,13 * page 346, column R, line 66 - page 347, column L, line 51 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397285
 [A]  REXFORD J ET AL, "SCALABLE ARCHITECTURES FOR INTEGRATED TRAFFIC SHAPING AND LINK SCHEDULING IN HIGH-SPEED ATM SWITCHES", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19970601), vol. 15, no. 5, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 938 - 950, XP000657043 [A] 1-13 * page 938, column L, line 8 - line 11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.594854