Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972478

EP0972478 - Steam vent for cookware [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 22.12.2004  [2004/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Au, Sin Ting
Flat 3, 27F, Block 7, Sun Tuen Mun Centre, Tuen Mun, N.T.
Hong Kong / CN
[2001/37]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Sunderland Holdings Limited
Suite 1905, 19th Floor, Tower 2, Enterprise Square, Sheung Yuet Road
Kowloon Bay, Kowloon / HK
Inventor(s)01 / Wai, Hon-Wah, c/o Sunderland Holdings Limited
S. 1905, 19 Flr, T. 2, Ent. Sq., Sheung Yuet Road
Kowloon Bay, Kowloon / HK
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Godwin, Edgar James , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Godwin, Edgar James , et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [2000/03]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99303897.519.05.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011445913.07.1998         Original published format: US 114459
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972478
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972478
Date:06.02.2002
[2002/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972478
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47J27/092
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/46]
Former [2002/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  LI 
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL11.02.2002
LT11.02.2002
LV11.02.2002
MK11.02.2002
RO11.02.2002
SI11.02.2002
TitleGerman:Dampfauslass für Kochgeräte[2000/03]
English:Steam vent for cookware[2000/03]
French:Dispositif d'évacuation de la vapeur pour ustensiles de cuisine[2000/03]
Examination procedure11.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
07.08.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.12.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
26.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2003Fee for grant paid
26.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.09.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
ES09.03.2004
[2004/52]
Former [2004/46]NL26.11.2003
ES09.03.2004
Former [2004/33]NL26.11.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4557396  (BAUMGARTEN GERD D [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 7 *;
 [A]GB2309766  (SUNDERLAND HOLDINGS LTD [HK]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5370257  (CHAMEROY ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8707824  (SILCRAFT SALES PTY LTD [AU])