EP0960655 - Method for grinding silicon metalloid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bush, Thomas Alva 11971 North Barry Road Wheeler, Michigan 48662 / US | 02 /
Herman, John Eric 2109 Martybrook Court LeGrange, Kentucky 40031 / US | 03 /
Marko, Ollie william 1130 martin Road Carrollton, Kentucky 41008 / US | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303934.6 | 20.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | US19980084275 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: US 84275 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0960655 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0960655 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960655 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B02C23/06 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
B02C23/06 (EP,US);
B24B37/042 (EP,US);
C01B33/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/01] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Mahlen von Silizium | [1999/48] | English: | Method for grinding silicon metalloid | [1999/48] | French: | Procédé de broyage de silicium | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 21.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.03.2006 | GB | 15.06.2006 | [2007/30] |
Former [2006/45] | NL | 15.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0494837 (PECHINEY ELECTROMETALLURGIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 3, line 17 - line 27 * * page 3, line 50 - line 55 *; | [A]SU1257164 ; | [A]EP0336453 (ECC INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [AD]US4162044 (KLIMPEL RICHARD R [US], et al); | [AD]US5312948 (FREEBURNE STEVEN K [US], et al) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 19, Database accession no. 1987-134084, XP002160301 & SU1257164 A 19860915 (BULATOV) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3604634 | US4162044 | US4274599 | US5131600 | US5312948 |