Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054074

EP1054074 - A free machining steel bearing bismuth and sulfur with superior high temperature ductility, and manufacturing method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.2005  [2005/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POHANG IRON & STEEL CO., LTD.
1, Koedong-dong, Nam-ku Pohang-si
Kyungsangbook-do 790-300 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
POHANG IRON & STEEL CO., LTD.
1, Koedong-dong, Nam-ku
Pohang City, Kyongsangbook-do 790-300 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Sam Kyo
Pohang Iron & Steel Co.,Ltd., 1 Koedong-dong
Nam-ku, Pohang-si, Kyungsangbook-do / KR
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Powell, Timothy John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99303965.021.05.1999
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1054074
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1054074
Date:27.06.2001
[2001/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/04
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/12]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wismut und Schwefel enthaltenden zerspanbaren Stahl mit ausgezeichneter Dehnbarkeit bei hohen Temperaturen und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2000/47]
English:A free machining steel bearing bismuth and sulfur with superior high temperature ductility, and manufacturing method therefor[2000/47]
French:Acier de decolletage contenant du bismuth et du soufre et présentant de ductilité excellent à haut température, et son procédé de fabrication[2000/47]
Examination procedure05.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/47]
19.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/17]
11.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYA]JPH06114500  ;
 [XA]US4255188  (RIEKELS LYNDA M) [X] 1 * column 3, line 46 - line 52; example D * [A] 3,4,6;
 [YA]EP0219194  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 33 - line 41; examples 3-5,7-12 * [A] 10;
 [A]JPH05331592
 [XYA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940725), vol. 018, no. 396, Database accession no. (M - 1644), [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 8 [A] 3,4,6
 [A]  - Spurenelemente in Stählen, DÜSSELDORF, VERLAG STAHLEISEN, XP002119883 [A] * page 20; table 5.4 *
 [A]  - CHO, SAM-KYU, "Effect of hot rolling and bismuth content on the hot ductility in free machining steel with bismuth and manganese sulfide", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19961111), vol. 125, no. 20, Database accession no. 254479, XP002119884 [A] * abstract *
    [] - TAEHAN KUMSOK HAKHOECHI (1996), 34(7), 823-829,
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940323), vol. 018, no. 170, Database accession no. (C - 1182), [A] 8-12 * abstract *