Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973269

EP0973269 - Audio signal noise reduction system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2008
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuji, Masayuki
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / Tsujishita, Masahiro
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / Taura, Kenichi
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / Ishida, Masayuki
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2009/48]
Former [2000/03]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RH / GB
Application number, filing date99303997.324.05.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020294817.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20294898
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973269
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973269
Date:17.04.2002
[2002/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973269
Date:19.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/16, H03G3/34
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/02]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rauschverminderungssystem für Audiosignale[2007/18]
English:Audio signal noise reduction system[2000/03]
French:Système de réduction du bruit pour signaux audio[2000/03]
Former [2000/03]Rauschverminderungssystem für Audiosignalen
Examination procedure15.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
27.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2007Fee for grant paid
06.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4574390  (HIROHASHI KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 16 * column 1, line 16 - column 3, line 41; figures 2-4 * [A] 1-15;
 [A]US4694500  (TAZAKI SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,9,15 * column A; figures 3,4,6 *
ExaminationJPH08149098
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 10,