blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968932


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.08.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
05.07.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
12.04.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
26.10.2001 First examination report
25.10.2001 Examination report or reply
16.05.2001 Renewal fee
25.09.2000 Change - extension states
28.07.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]