blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968932
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000043942Global Dossier 15.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US10835898 01.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0968932Global Dossier 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US10835898 01.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5988387 23.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US10835898 01.07.1998