Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968932

EP0968932 - Suspension package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.09.2002  [2002/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADE, INC.
1430 East 130th Street Chicago
Illinois 60633-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
ADE, INC.
1430 East 130th Street
Chicago, Illinois 60633-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Staal, Dean
1430 East 130th Street
Chicago Illinois 60633 / US
02 / Bartlett, William
810 Progressive Lane
South Beliot Illinois 61073 / US
03 / Keach, Priscilla
1430 East 130 Street
Chicago Illinois 60633 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date99304017.925.05.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010835801.07.1998         Original published format: US 108358
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968932
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/07
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verpackung mit schwebender Aufhängung[2000/01]
English:Suspension package[2000/01]
French:Emballage à suspension[2000/01]
Examination procedure10.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
30.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/38]
16.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2681142  (COHEN HAROLD L) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 20; figure - *;
 [YD]US5769235  (KEACH PRISCILLA M [US], et al) [YD] 1-4 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 3; figure - *;
 [AD]US4491225  (BAILLOD FREDERIC [CH]) [AD] 1 * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 16; figure - *