EP0962515 - Processed solid burnable fuel composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Java Logg Global Corporation 30E Lower Halcyon Heights Lascelles, BB 24119 Saint James / BB | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Sprules, Rodney K. 88 Greynam Court Nepean, Ontario K2G 5T3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sprules, Rodney K. 4453 Station E. Ottawa, Ontario K1S 5B4 / CA | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry, et al Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Jones, Graham Henry, et al Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road London SE3 7LG / GB | ||
Former [1999/49] | Jones, Graham H. Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304207.6 | 28.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | US19980086797 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 86797 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962515 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962515 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10L5/44, C10L11/04 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C10L5/44 (EP,US);
C10L5/40 (US);
C10L11/04 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/49] | Title | German: | Prozessierte feste brennbare Brennstoffzusammensetzung | [1999/49] | English: | Processed solid burnable fuel composition | [1999/49] | French: | Composition de combustible traité solide | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2006 | BE | 05.07.2006 | CH | 05.07.2006 | CY | 05.07.2006 | LI | 05.07.2006 | DK | 05.10.2006 | SE | 05.10.2006 | GR | 06.10.2006 | PT | 05.12.2006 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1060464 ; | [YD]US4326854 (TANNER JOHN D) [YD] 1-11 * example 26; claim - *; | [Y]GB2091760 (TIGER TIM PRODUCTS LTD) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5393310 (WOLLEN KENNETH E [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 098, no. 008, & JP10060464 A 19980303 (SHINAGAWA FUEL CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |