Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0962620

EP0962620 - A two-stage drill bit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diamond Products International, Inc.
15955 W. Hardy, Suite 300 Houston
Texas 77060 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Diamond Products International, Inc.
15955 W. Hardy, Suite 300
Houston, Texas 77060 / US
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
Diamond Productions International, Inc.
15955 W. Hardy, Suite 300
Houston, Texas 77060 / US
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
Diamond Products International, Inc.
15955 W. Hardy, Suite 300
Houston, Texas 77060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fielder, Coy
13006 Marron Drive, Cypress
Texas 77429 / US
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Frankland, Nigel Howard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Frankland, Nigel Howard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99304219.128.05.1999
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateUS19980088010P28.05.1998         Original published format: US 88010 P
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962620
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0962620
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962620
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/26
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2001/23]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zweistufiger Bohrkopf[1999/49]
English:A two-stage drill bit[1999/49]
French:Trépan de forage à deux étages[1999/49]
Examination procedure13.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
14.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2004Fee for grant paid
18.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5678644  (FIELDER COY [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 25; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4515227  (CERKOVNIK JERRY [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 3, line 27 - line 47; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4887677  (WARREN TOMMY M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 16, line 33 - line 59; figure 24 *;
 [PX]EP0872624  (CAMCO INT UK LTD [GB]) [PX] 1-3,6-10 * column 15, line 48 - column 16, line 38; figure 6 * * column 16, line 46 - column 17, line 16 *;
 [PX]GB2328698  (SMITH INTERNATIONAL [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 3, line 1 - line 22; figure 1 *;
 [E]US5957223  (DOSTER MICHAEL L [US], et al) [E] 1-3,5-10 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 28; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO9815710  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [A] 1,7,10 * column 11, line 3 - line 31; figures 7,8 *