Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968691

EP0968691 - Prosthesis provided with a mantle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.11.2002
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.01.2003  [2003/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Benoist Girard SAS
203, Boulevard de la Grande Delle
14200 Hérouville-Saint-Clair / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
BENOIST GIRARD SAS
203, Boulevard de la Grande Delle
14200 Hérouville-Saint-Clair / FR
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BENOIST GIRARD ET CIE
203, Boulevard de la Grande Delle, B.P. 8
14201 Hérouville-Saint-Clair Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Ling, Robin Sydney Mackwood, Prof.
Lod Cottage, The Lane, Dittisham
Dartmouth, Devon TQ6 OHB / GB
02 / Gie, Graham Allan
Latymers Courtenays, Binneford
Yeoford, Devon EX17 5EZ / GB
03 / Timperley, Andrew John
3 Lyndhurst Road, St. Leonard's
Exeter, EX2 4PA / GB
04 / Storer, John Andrew
8 Hameau de Bernières
14250 Jouaye Mondaye, Bayeux / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Bridge-Butler, Alan James
Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Bridge-Butler, Alan James
G.F. Redfern & Co., 7 Staple Inn, Holborn
London WC1V 7QF / GB
Application number, filing date99304220.928.05.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001206904.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9812069
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968691
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968691
Date:17.10.2001
[2001/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30
[2000/01]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/27]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mit einem Mantel versehene Prothese[2000/01]
English:Prosthesis provided with a mantle[2000/01]
French:Prothèse pourvue d'un manteau[2000/01]
Examination procedure18.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/03]
14.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.05.2002M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5755720  (MIKHAIL W E MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,5,11-15,19,25-28 * column 4, line 18 - line 22; figures 7,11,12 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 12 * [A] 2,3,6,16-18,20 [Y] 7-10,21-25;
 [XA]US4881536  (NOBLE PHILLIP C [US], et al) [X] 1,11-15,25-28 * figures 1,3; claims 4,7 * [A] 6,20;
 [YA]US5314493  (MIKHAIL W E MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 7-10,21-25 * figures 2,5-9; claims 1,2 * [A] 1,5,6,11-15,20,26-28;
 [A]WO8503426  (JOINT MEDICAL PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,6,11-13,15,16,20,25-27 * figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [A]EP0457464  (HOWMEDICA [IE]) [A] 1,6-8,10 * figure -; claims 1-4 *
by applicantEP0457464