Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970632

EP0970632 - Slide zipper assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025-5811 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Van Erden, Donald L.
33456 Lakeview Court
Wildwood, Illinois 60030 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99304231.601.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998009311108.06.1998         Original published format: US 93111
US1998012885804.08.1998         Original published format: US 128858
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970632
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970632
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A44B19/16, A44B19/26
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reissverschluss[2000/02]
English:Slide zipper assembly[2000/02]
French:Fermeture à glissière[2000/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
29.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2003Fee for grant paid
19.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.01.2004
BE28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
IT28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
NL28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
DE29.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
IE01.06.2004
LU01.06.2004
PT28.06.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/12]AT28.01.2004
BE28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
NL28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
DE29.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
IE01.06.2004
LU01.06.2004
Former [2005/24]AT28.01.2004
BE28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
DE29.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
IE01.06.2004
LU01.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT28.01.2004
BE28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
DE29.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
LU01.06.2004
Former [2005/12]AT28.01.2004
BE28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
DE29.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
Former [2005/02]AT28.01.2004
BE28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
Former [2005/01]AT28.01.2004
BE28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
Former [2004/46]AT28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
ES09.05.2004
Former [2004/44]AT28.01.2004
CH28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
LI28.01.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
Former [2004/43]AT28.01.2004
FI28.01.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
Former [2004/41]FI28.01.2004
GR28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
Former [2004/40]FI28.01.2004
SE28.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US2916197  (DETRIE ARTHUR J, et al) [X] 1,3,6,7 * column 4, line 36 - line 70; figures 6-8 *;
 [A]FR2586650  (FLEXICO FRANCE SARL [FR]) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-12; claims 1-4,20-25 *;
 [A]FR1564039  (L. K. LAGUERRE) [A] 2,4,5 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 36; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3685562  (AUSNIT STEVEN) [A] 8,9 * column 3, paragraph 2 - column 4, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *;
 [AP]WO9852438  (KCL CORP [US], et al) [AP] 5 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 7; figures 1-6; claim 1 *
by applicantUS5007143
 US5008971
 US5131121
 US5664299