Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971165

EP0971165 - Pumpless liquid dispensing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.07.2001 [2001/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kwok, Kui-Chiu
655 Woodhaven Drive
Mundelin, Lake County Illinois 60060 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99304354.603.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998009665812.06.1998         Original published format: US 96658
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971165
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971165
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16N7/30
[2000/02]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/44]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pumpenloses Flüssigkeitsabgabesystem[2000/02]
English:Pumpless liquid dispensing system[2000/02]
French:Dispositif de distribution de liquide sans pompe[2000/02]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/27]
18.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4345668  (GAUNT FRANK L) [DA] 1,6 * column W *;
 [A]US5524729  (BOELKINS WALLACE G) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 32 - column 14, line 11; figure - *;
 [A]US3547350  (MARCOUX ARTHUR) [A] 1,6 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]GB1514576  (ELITEX ZAVODY TEXTILNIHO) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3932065  (GINSBERG GUENTER ET AL) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]US4030640  (CITRIN PAUL S ET AL) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]US5035350  (BLETTE RUSSELL E ET AL) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure - *
by applicantUS4345668